AZ HB2230 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal tax exemption; commercial lease
Title
Municipal tax exemption; commercial lease
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | House final reading , voting: (39-20-1-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-05 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-29 | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-4-1-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-02-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-02-14 | House third reading , voting: (40-20-0-0) | |
2011-02-10 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | House Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:23 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-01 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-20 | House read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |