AZ HB2280 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-18 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Fire protection systems; inspections
Title
Fire protection systems; inspections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 861 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 495 | New Code | See Bill Text |