AZ HB2281 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ELL instruction; dual language programs
Title
ELL instruction; dual language programs
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. Mark Finchem [R] | Rep. Daniel Hernandez [D] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] | Rep. Becky Nutt [R] |
Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-02-12 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-1-0) |
2018-02-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-01-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-01-29 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-01-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-22 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-01-18 | House | House read second time |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2018-01-17 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |