AZ HB2297 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 347
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Political advertisements; contributors; disclosure
Title
Political advertisements; contributors; disclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 23 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 347 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | House final reading , voting: (31-24-5-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-11-2-0) |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-25 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-23-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2016-01-21 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House ELECT Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2016-01-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |