AZ HB2303 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Mandatory vehicle impoundment; exception
Title
Mandatory vehicle impoundment; exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-02-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |