AZ HB2326 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural feed; sales; tax exemption
Title
Agricultural feed; sales; tax exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Rep. Noel Campbell [R] |
Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Agriculture, Water and Lands Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 361 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | House final reading , voting: (49-7-4-0) |
2016-05-07 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (23-5-2-0) |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-0-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-01-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | House AWL Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-1-0) |
2016-01-26 | House | Referred to House AWL Committee |
2016-01-26 | House | House read second time |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Assigned to House AWL Committee |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |