AZ HB2332 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Healthy forest enterprise incentives; extension
Title
Healthy forest enterprise incentives; extension
Sponsors
Rep. Brenda Barton [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Rep. Doris Goodale [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] |
Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Rep. Nancy McLain [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Rep. Macario Saldate [D] |
Rep. Steve Urie [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - House - House Agriculture and Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-30 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-30 | House final reading , voting: (55-4-1-0) | |
2012-04-30 | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-04-18 | Transmit to House | |
2012-04-18 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2012-03-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-03-06 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-15 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) | |
2012-03-07 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-07 | Senate read second time | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-03-06 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-03-05 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-05 | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-1-0-0) | |
2012-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (12-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-26 | House AW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-01-18 | Referred to House AW Committee | |
2012-01-18 | House read second time | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Assigned to House AW Committee | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced in House and read first time |