AZ HB2357 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House Conference caucus date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-27 - House Conference caucus date
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Restrictions; electronic smoking devices
Title
Restrictions; electronic smoking devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2019-05-09 | House | House Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference members: CARTER, BROPHY MCGEE, OTONDO |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2019-05-09 | House | House Conference members: TOMA, BUTLER, UDALL |
2019-05-09 | House | House Conference appointed |
2019-05-08 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-08 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-2-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (38-22-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3622 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 601.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 798.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |