AZ HB2358 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Transmit to House
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Landlord tenant; partial payment; assistance

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Landlord tenant; partial payment; assistance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-24SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (19-7-4-0)
2019-05-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-24HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (35-25-0-0)
2019-05-24HouseHouse Conference adopted
2019-05-21HouseHouse Conference caucus date
2019-05-15SenateSenate Conference adopted
2019-05-14SenateSenate Conference caucus date
2019-05-08SenateSenate Minority report
2019-05-08HouseHouse Minority report
2019-05-08HouseHouse Conference report: That the House accept the Senate amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended.
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference members: CARTER, LIVINGSTON, MENDEZ
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference appointed
2019-05-01HouseHouse Conference members: TOMA, BUTLER, WENINGER
2019-05-01HouseHouse Conference appointed
2019-04-30HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-30HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-18HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-18SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (16-13-1-0)
2019-04-17SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-18SenateSenate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate read second time
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate GOV Committee
2019-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-02-26SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-15-0-0)
2019-02-25HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse consent calendar
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-12HouseHouse COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
331371Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71455
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2358p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2358h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2358s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2358c.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2358farnsworth d1011.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/ccamendments/54leg/1r/h.2358 fcc.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71455&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71455&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=186822&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=186843&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71455&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71455&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=188996&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=189022&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=189770&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71455&billStatusActionId=189789&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback