AZ HB2367 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Chapter 169
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Limited audit review; electronic portal
Title
Limited audit review; electronic portal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Chapter 169 |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-04-30 | House | House concurs |
2019-04-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |