AZ HB2378 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Chapter 137
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Adoption; child welfare; dependency

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adoption; child welfare; dependency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateChapter 137
2019-04-26SenateGovernor Signed
2019-04-22SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-04-22HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (45-13-2-0)
2019-04-22HouseHouse concurs
2019-04-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-16HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2019-04-15HouseTransmit to House
2019-04-15SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-04-11SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-09SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-09SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-08SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-28SenateSenate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0)
2019-03-06SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-05SenateAssigned to Senate HHS Committee
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-04HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-1-0)
2019-02-28HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-18HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-07HouseHouse HHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0)
2019-01-31HouseHouse read second time
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-01-30HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2019-01-30HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8514.02Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8514.03Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
8514.08New CodeSee Bill Text
8533Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8807.01Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8810Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71501
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2378p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2378h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2378s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0137.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2378barto2.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2378health & human services.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.2378brophy mcgee.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.2378hhs.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71501&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71501&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=187479&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=187590&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71501&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71501&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=188932&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=188960&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=189066&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71501&billStatusActionId=189071&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback