AZ HB2385 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; ADM calculation
Title
Schools; ADM calculation
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Boone [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | House final reading , voting: (56-3-1-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2010-03-23 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-24 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-24 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2010-03-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-22 | House third reading , voting: (55-3-2-0) | |
2010-03-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-03-02 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-2-2-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-24 | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-02-01 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House APPROP Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |