AZ HB2421 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animal cruelty; working animal; harassment
Title
Animal cruelty; working animal; harassment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Senate | Chapter 32 |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |