AZ HB2439 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 238
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Cosmetology; regulation
Title
Cosmetology; regulation
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Mark Cardenas [D] | Rep. David Stevens [R] | Rep. Tom Forese [R] |
Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Rep. Ethan Orr [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Chapter 238 | |
2014-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | House final reading , voting: (53-0-7-0) |
2014-04-21 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (21-2-7-0) |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2014-02-10 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-02-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2014-02-06 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-04 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-04 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-03 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-29 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-01-28 | House | House read second time |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-01-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |