AZ HB2445 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 363
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Motor vehicle insurance; nonrenewal
Title
Motor vehicle insurance; nonrenewal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 363 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-07 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Withdrawn |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-26 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (29-29-2-0) |
2016-02-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House INS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House INS Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House INS Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |