AZ HB2450 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Water and wastewater charges; payment
Title
Water and wastewater charges; payment
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] |
Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate Consent Calendar April 12, 2010 @ 2:35 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-0) | |
2010-03-17 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-15 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-15 | House third reading , voting: (36-19-4-0) | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-16 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in House and read first time |