AZ HB2457 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Charitable organization filings
Title
Charitable organization filings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 14 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 21 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (14-13-3-0) |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-21-4-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-01-23 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2013-01-24 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | House read second time |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2013-01-23 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |