AZ HB2475 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Chapter 348
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Funeral establishments; procurement organizations
Title
Funeral establishments; procurement organizations
Sponsors
Rep. Jill Norgaard [R] | Sen. Juan Mendez [D] | Rep. Russell Bowers [R] | Rep. Regina Cobb [R] |
Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Darin Mitchell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Chapter 348 | |
2016-05-18 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (53-0-7-0) |
2016-05-06 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-02-19 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-02-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-02-17 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2016-02-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-02-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-02-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |