AZ HB2477 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Chapter 155
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adjudication statutes; unconstitutional provisions; repeal
Title
Adjudication statutes; unconstitutional provisions; repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Chapter 155 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-27 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House NREW Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 321.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 162 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 164 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 256 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 257 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 261 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 262 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
45 | 263 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |