AZ HB2501 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Commerce authority; adult workforce education.
Title
Commerce authority; adult workforce education.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] |
Rep. John Fillmore [R] | Rep. Kevin Payne [R] | Rep. Tony Rivero [R] | Rep. Ben Toma [R] |
Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-17 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-3-1-2-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |