AZ HB2507 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax valuation; governmental actions
Title
Property tax valuation; governmental actions
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-14 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-14 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (60-0-0-0) | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-20 | House read second time | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2010-01-19 | Introduced in House and read first time |