AZ HB2520 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Schools; reading requirements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; reading requirements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-30 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Motion Senator Allen to show the bill be retained on the calendar. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-16SenateChapter 309
2018-05-16SenateGovernor Signed
2018-05-01SenateTransmitted to Governor
2018-04-30HouseHouse final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0)
2018-04-30HouseHouse concurs
2018-04-24HouseHouse minority caucus: Conference
2018-04-24HouseHouse Conference Committee recommended
2018-04-16HouseTransmit to House
2018-04-16SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0)
2018-04-05SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2018-03-29SenateSenate motion to amend
2018-03-29SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
2018-03-20SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-20SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2018-03-19SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2018-03-15SenateSenate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0)
2018-03-01SenateSenate read second time
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2018-02-28SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2018-02-28SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2018-02-22SenateTransmit to Senate
2018-02-21HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2018-02-19HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2018-02-19HouseHouse consent calendar
2018-02-19HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0)
2018-02-12HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-2-0-0)
2018-02-07HouseHouse read second time
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2018-02-06HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2018-02-06HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.03Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15249.09Amended CodeSee Bill Text
15701Repealed CodeSee Bill Text
15704Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/70754
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2520p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2520h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/bills/hb2520s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/laws/0309.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25200222.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/proposed/s.25200250.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2520ed.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/53leg/2r/adopted/s.2520floorallen s.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70754&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70754&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=181454&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70754&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=70754&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=182786&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=182813&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=182997&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=183283&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=183434&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=70754&billStatusActionId=183444&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback