AZ HB2531 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax; instant depreciation
Title
Income tax; instant depreciation
Sponsors
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Rep. Ethan Orr [R] | Sen. Kimberly Yee [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Justin Pierce [R] | Sen. Thomas Shope [R] | Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-26 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | House | House final reading , voting: (50-8-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-05 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-8-3-0) |
2013-02-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2013-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-11 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2013-02-06 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2013-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |