AZ HB2535 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-19 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
DCS; prohibited acts; firearms
Title
DCS; prohibited acts; firearms
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-19 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-02-19 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-02-14 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |