AZ HB2541 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; wage board; powers
Title
Technical correction; wage board; powers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - House Employment and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | House final reading , voting: (52-8-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2011-03-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-07 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-07 | House third reading , voting: (56-3-1-0) | |
2011-03-02 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | House ERA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-09 | Referred to House ERA Committee | |
2011-02-09 | House read second time | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Assigned to House ERA Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Introduced in House and read first time |