AZ HB2552 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Chapter 105
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State lottery; prizewinner confidentiality
Title
State lottery; prizewinner confidentiality
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 105 |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-20 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-0-2-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-11 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |