AZ HB2556 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Chapter 294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Agricultural property; uses; rural activities
Title
Agricultural property; uses; rural activities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Water and Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House Land & Agriculture Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Senate | Chapter 294 |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-24 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2019-05-24 | House | House concurs |
2019-05-23 | House | House minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-23 | House | House Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-15 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Senate WAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate WAG Committee |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-4-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-21 | House | House LAG Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House LAG Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 812 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 12151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |