AZ HB2591 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Chapter 370
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil traffic violations; alternative service
Title
Civil traffic violations; alternative service
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 22 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - House - House Government and Higher Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | Chapter 370 | |
2016-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2016-05-06 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-06 | House | House final reading , voting: (32-22-6-0) |
2016-05-04 | House | House Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2016-04-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Senate TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANS Committee |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2016-03-02 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (50-9-1-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) |
2016-02-04 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-18 | House | House GHE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-08 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Assigned to House GHE Committee |
2016-02-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |