AZ HB2596 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Free exercise of religion
Title
Free exercise of religion
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | House final reading , voting: (44-13-3-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-21 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-21 | Senate third reading , voting: (17-12-1-0) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Consent Calendar April 14, 2010 @ 1:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-22 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) | |
2010-03-08 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-08 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2010-03-04 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-03-03 | House third reading , voting: (36-24-0-0) | |
2010-02-25 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-02-22 | House Consent Calendar February 22, 2010 @ 2:00 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-23 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-23 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-22 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-2-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |