AZ HB2608 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 39-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
EORP; closure; defined contribution
Title
EORP; closure; defined contribution
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House Insurance and Retirement Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-13 | House | House final reading , voting: (35-24-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Concurrence FAILED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-05-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-12-6-0) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2013-03-01 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (35-22-3-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-02-26 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-02-12 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-19 | House | House IR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0-0) |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to House IR Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Assigned to House IR Committee |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |