AZ HB2616 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Workers' compensation; controlled substances
Title
Workers' compensation; controlled substances
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-01 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-14 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2011-04-20 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Consent Calendar March 21, 2011 @ 12:46 PM | |
2011-03-22 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-15 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Senate read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | House third reading , voting: (56-1-3-0) | |
2011-02-23 | House Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 3:31 PM | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-08 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-02-08 | House read second time | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |