AZ HB2627 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Timeshares; public reports; purchase contracts
Title
Timeshares; public reports; purchase contracts
Sponsors
Sen. Shawnna Bolick [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] |
Rep. Amish Shah [D] | Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-2-0) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-02-25 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2197.08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2197.10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |