AZ HB2656 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1538
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 328
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic wills and trusts.
Title
Electronic wills and trusts.
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2656 substituted for SB 1538 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2656 substituted for SB 1538 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 328 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-4-1-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2656 substituted for SB 1538 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (49-11-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1538 (Replaces) 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14 | 1201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2506 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2507 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2518 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2519 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2520 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2521 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2522 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 2523 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 3402 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 3971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |