AZ HB2657 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1539
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Interscholastic activities; health dangers; information
Title
Interscholastic activities; health dangers; information
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2657 substituted for SB 1539 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Motion HB 2657 substituted for SB 1539 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 329 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-04 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-03 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2657 substituted for SB 1539 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-6-0-0) |
2018-05-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-04-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1539 (Replaces) 2018-05-03 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass