AZ HB2687 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Chapter 233
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Condominiums; appraisals; termination

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Condominiums; appraisals; termination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateChapter 233
2019-05-14SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-09SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-08HouseTransmit to House
2019-05-08SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0)
2019-04-22SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-26SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-25SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-03-21SenateSenate COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0)
2019-03-13SenateSenate read second time
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-03-12SenateAssigned to Senate COM Committee
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-03-12SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-03-11HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0)
2019-03-07HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-03-05HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-05HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-03-04HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-02-19HouseHouse COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-02-14HouseHouse read second time
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to House COM Committee
2019-02-13HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
331228Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72331
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2687p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2687h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0233.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.2687jw.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.2687commerce.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72331&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72331&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72331&billStatusActionId=188047&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72331&billStatusActionId=188150&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72331&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72331&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72331&billStatusActionId=189058&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72331&billStatusActionId=189476&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback