AZ HB2706 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Interscholastic athletics; biological sex

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Interscholastic athletics; biological sex

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-05-08SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-03-04SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-03-03HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2020-03-03HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2020-02-26HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-26HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-3-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-13HouseHouse HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-04HouseHouse read second time
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-02-03HouseAssigned to House HHS Committee
2020-02-03HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
15120.01New CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/73533
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2706p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/bills/hb2706h.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/proposed/h.2706barto.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/2r/adopted/h.2706health human services.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73533&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=73533&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73533&billStatusActionId=195085&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=73533&billStatusActionId=195093&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback