AZ HB2709 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-16)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
CTEDs; nonprofits; private postsecondary institutions
Title
CTEDs; nonprofits; private postsecondary institutions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-03-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-07 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-07 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-06 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-14 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Boards, Commissions And Committees -- Current
Career Technical Education Districts
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Governing Board
Nonprofit Organizations
Career Technical Education Districts
Cteds
Education - Title 15
Governing Board
Nonprofit Organizations