AZ HB2752 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Note: Replaces legislation SB1557
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.
Title
Criminal justice; budget reconciliation; 2019-2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2752 substituted for SB 1554. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion Should the Ruling of the Chair that the Salman Amendment is not germane under House Rule 16 be overturned? (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2752 substituted for SB 1554. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - Motion Should the Ruling of the Chair that the Salman Amendment is not germane under House Rule 16 be overturned? (Y: 29 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Senate | Chapter 268 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate miscellaneous motion: HB 2752 substituted for SB 1557. Motion carried. |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0) |
2019-05-24 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-05-24 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Should the Ruling of the Chair that the Salman Amendment is not germane under House Rule 16 be overturned?, voting: (29-31-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-05-23 | House | House read second time |
2019-05-23 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-05-22 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-05-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Same As/Similar To
SB1557 (Replaces) 2019-05-25 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Criminal Code - Title 13
Criminal Justice
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Appropriations
Budget Bills
Budget Reconciliation
Criminal Code - Title 13
Criminal Justice
State Government - Title 41
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 2314.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 202 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1744 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 2832 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 1531.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |