AZ HB2759 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Note: Replaces legislation SB1547

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 24 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Senate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Appropriations; direct services; referrals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriations; direct services; referrals

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 15 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Motion HB 2759 substituted for SB 1547. Motion carried. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27SenateSenate third reading FAILED voting: (15-14-1-0)
2019-05-27SenateSenate miscellaneous motion: HB 2759 substituted for SB 1547. Motion carried.
2019-05-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-05-24SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-05-24HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (31-29-0-0)
2019-05-23HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-05-23HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-05-23HouseHouse read second time
2019-05-23HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-3-0-1-0-0)
2019-05-22HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-4-0-0-0-0)
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-05-21HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-05-21HouseIntroduced in House and read first time

Same As/Similar To

SB1547 (Replaces) 2019-05-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended

Subjects


Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/72433
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2759p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/hb2759h.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72433&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=72433&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72433&billStatusActionId=189732&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72433&billStatusActionId=189743&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72433&billStatusActionId=189895&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=72433&billStatusActionId=189904&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback