AZ HB2778 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State board of appraisal
Title
State board of appraisal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2012-05-01 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-04-16 | House final reading , voting: (48-8-3-0) | |
2012-03-29 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-29 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-27 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (22-7-1-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-03-14 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (3-1-2-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-02-28 | Senate read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2012-02-24 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-02-23 | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-3-3-0) | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-21 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-21 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-20 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-13 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-08 | House read second time | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Introduced in House and read first time |