AZ HB2841 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Municipal zoning; housing overlay
Title
Municipal zoning; housing overlay
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-2-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-2-0-2-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2020-02-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 2183 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
9 | 462.09 | New Code | See Bill Text |