AZ HCR2011 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Senate consent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Border patrol

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Border patrol

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-16 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16SenateSenate consent calendar
2020-03-16SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2020-03-11SenateSenate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-1-0)
2020-03-02SenateSenate read second time
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2020-02-27SenateAssigned to Senate TPS Committee
2020-02-27SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2020-02-25SenateTransmit to Senate
2020-02-25HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (35-25-0-0)
2020-02-18HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-18HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2020-02-17HouseHouse consent calendar
2020-02-17HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0)
2020-02-12HouseHouse PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-1-0-0)
2020-01-27HouseHouse read second time
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2020-01-23HouseAssigned to House PS Committee
2020-01-23HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2020-01-07HousePrefile

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback