AZ HCR2020 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Senate read second time
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Lieutenant governor; joint candidacy
Title
Lieutenant governor; joint candidacy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Elections Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - House Elections Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - House - House Government Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (40-20-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | House ELECT Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-1-0-0) |
2020-02-03 | House | House read second time |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned to House ELECT Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |