AZ HCR2023 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Transmitted to Secretary Of State
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Auditor general; reappointment
Title
Auditor general; reappointment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Transmitted to Secretary Of State | |
2010-04-20 | Transmit to House | |
2010-04-19 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2010-04-05 | Senate Consent Calendar April 05, 2010 @ 3:05 PM | |
2010-04-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Senate read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee | |
2010-02-23 | Introduced in Senate and read first time | |
2010-02-22 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-02-22 | House third reading , voting: (57-0-3-0) | |
2010-02-15 | House Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 1:30 PM | |
2010-02-16 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-26 | House read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in House and read first time |