AZ HJR2001 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-27 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-27 - Assigned to Senate RULES Committee
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sexual exploitation; trafficking; health crisis
Title
Sexual exploitation; trafficking; health crisis
Sponsors
Rep. Walter Blackman [R] | Rep. Leo Biasiucci [R] | Sen. Frank Carroll [R] | Rep. Alma Hernandez [D] |
Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-02-28 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |