AZ SB1010 | 2021 | Fifty-fifth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recounts; requests; procedures; audits
Title
Recounts; requests; procedures; audits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - House Government & Elections Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-03-29 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-24 | House | House GE Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-6-0-0-0-0) |
2021-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GE Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2021-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Attorney General
Audits
Bond
Conduct Of Elections
Early Ballots
Election Recounts
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Exemptions
Legislative Council
Procedures
Recount Request
Recounts
Requests
Secretary Of State
Statistical Significance
Vote Count Verification Committee
Voting Center
Audits
Bond
Conduct Of Elections
Early Ballots
Election Recounts
Elections
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Exemptions
Legislative Council
Procedures
Recount Request
Recounts
Requests
Secretary Of State
Statistical Significance
Vote Count Verification Committee
Voting Center
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 602 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 661.01 | New Code | See Bill Text |