AZ SB1019 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-08 - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

TPT; over the top

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TPT; over the top

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-08SenateChapter 189
2019-05-08SenateGovernor Signed
2019-05-02SenateTransmitted to Governor
2019-05-02SenateSenate final reading PASSED, voting: (28-0-2-0)
2019-05-02SenateSenate concurs
2019-05-02SenateSenate Conference Committee recommended
2019-05-02SenateSenate minority caucus: Conference
2019-04-30SenateTransmit to Senate
2019-04-30HouseHouse third reading PASSED voting: (45-14-1-0)
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-04-16HouseHouse minority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-16HouseHouse majority caucus: Do pass
2019-04-15HouseHouse RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
2019-03-18HouseHouse ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (12-0-0-1-0-0)
2019-03-06HouseHouse read second time
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House RULES Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House APPROP Committee
2019-03-05HouseAssigned to House ED Committee
2019-03-05HouseIntroduced in House and read first time
2019-02-28HouseTransmit to House
2019-02-28SenateSenate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0)
2019-02-28SenateSenate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
2019-02-27SenateSenate minority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate majority caucus: Do pass
2019-02-27SenateSenate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0)
2019-02-26SenateSenate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (9-0-0-0)
2019-01-24SenateSenate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0)
2019-01-15SenateSenate read second time
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate APPROP Committee
2019-01-14SenateAssigned to Senate HEWD Committee
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time
2019-01-07SenatePrefile

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
425040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
425064Amended CodeSee Bill Text
426004Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://apps.azleg.gov/BillStatus/BillOverview/71053
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1019p.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1019s.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/bills/sb1019h.htm
Texthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/laws/0189.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/s.1019gowan1.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/s.1019approp.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1019udall.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1019education.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/proposed/h.1019cobb.docx.htm
Amendmenthttps://www.azleg.gov/legtext/54leg/1r/adopted/h.1019appropriations.docx.htm
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#0
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#1
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#2
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=187352&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=187452&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#3
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#4
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusStandingAction/?billStatusId=71053&includeVotes=true&officialOnly=true#5
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=189220&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=189225&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=189331&includeVotes=true
Roll Callhttps://apps.azleg.gov/api/BillStatusFloorAction/?billStatusId=71053&billStatusActionId=189337&includeVotes=true

Bill Comments

feedback