AZ SB1029 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Chapter 182
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Qualifying physicians; opiate-dependent patients
Title
Qualifying physicians; opiate-dependent patients
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-04 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-07 | Senate | Chapter 182 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-30 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Prefile |
Subjects
Medical Board
Opiate Dependent Patients
Opioids
Physicians
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifying Physicians
Opiate Dependent Patients
Opioids
Physicians
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Qualifying Physicians
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |