AZ SB1053 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Character education special plate fund
Title
Character education special plate fund
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-24 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (25-5-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (35-24-1-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | House Consent Calendar April 06, 2011 @ 4:45 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-07 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-07 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-03 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:15 PM | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-11 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-01-11 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |