AZ SB1061 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-16 - Senate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Universities; tuition; rates; fees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Universities; tuition; rates; fees

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16SenateSenate ED Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-4-0-0)
2017-01-17SenateSenate read second time
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate RULES Committee
2017-01-12SenateAssigned to Senate ED Committee
2017-01-12SenateIntroduced in Senate and read first time

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
151626Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Arizona State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback